HI HCR103 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Analyze The Probable Effects Of The Proposed Mandated Coverage Of Health Insurance For Tobacco Cessation And Assess Whether Its Enactment Is Consistent With State Policy.
Title
Tobacco Cessation
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll excused. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from HLT/CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1395) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to LMG. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Ito, Keith-Agaran, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Ching, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Luke, McKelvey, Souki. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Pine. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/CPC on Friday, 04-01-11 11:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HLT/CPC, LMG, referral sheet 34 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-09 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR94 (Same As) 2011-04-05 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on LMG as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll excused.