HI HCR108 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-11 - Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 32
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Public Safety To Implement A Reserve Deputy Sheriff Program.
Title
Reserve Deputy Sheriff Program; Department of Public Safety
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
2014-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR75 (Same As) 2014-03-13 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=108&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR108_.HTM |