HI HCR110 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-24 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurers To Provide Coverage For Weight Management And Obesity Treatment For Children.
Title
Obesity treatment for children; insurance; Auditor report
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-24 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 977-10), recommending referral to CPC. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro, Finnegan. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-18-10 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, LMG, referral sheet 32 | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Offered | |
2010-02-19 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR124 (Same As) 2010-04-09 - (H) Referred to HLT/CPC, LMG, referral sheet 63