HI HCR112 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR112
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Amendment Of A Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Piers 24 To 26, Identified As "lot 12", In Honolulu Harbor, Oahu, For Pacific Shipyards International.
Title
Authorizing The Amendment Of A Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Piers 24 To 26, Identified As "lot 12", In Honolulu Harbor, Oahu, For Pacific Shipyards International.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2019-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 928). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2227) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 6 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Harimoto, Moriwaki, Riviere, Taniguchi, Fevella. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Nishihara, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Riviere. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-17-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL/WAM. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 615). |
2019-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2010), recommending adoption. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Holt. |
2019-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 11:30AM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1850), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen. |
2019-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-27-19 9:30AM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR112 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=112&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR112_.HTM |