HI HCR120 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and DeCoite, Lowen excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-30 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and DeCoite, Lowen excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting An Update Of The State Housing Functional Plan.
Title
State Planning Act; State Housing Functional Plan
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and DeCoite, Lowen excused (2). |
2015-03-30 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1253), recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-23 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Jordan, Belatti, Creagan, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Oshiro. |
2015-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Monday, 03-23-15 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
2015-03-12 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=120&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR120_.HTM |