HI HCR129 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to EDH/HRE.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - (S) Referred to EDH/HRE.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Working Group To Develop A Comprehensive Plan To Improve Awareness Of And Strengthen Support For Persons With Dyslexia.
Title
Students with Dyslexia; Working Group; DOE; UH
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to EDH/HRE. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 491). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1285-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Bertram, Herkes, M. Lee, Mizuno excused. | |
2010-03-29 | (H) Reported from EDN/HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1023-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Nakashima, Berg, Bertram, Hanohano, Rhoads, Saiki, Takai, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Manahan, Shimabukuro, Yamane, Ching, Pine. | |
2010-03-17 | (H) The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Berg, Bertram, Chang, Hanohano, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Takai; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Manahan, Shimabukuro, Yamane, Ching, Pine. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN/HED on Wednesday, 03-17-10 2:05PM in conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to EDN/HED, FIN, referral sheet 32 | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Offered | |
2010-02-25 | (H) To be offered. |