HI HCR129 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-13 - (S) Referred to TSM/TIA.
Pending: Senate Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-13 - (S) Referred to TSM/TIA.
Pending: Senate Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Inclusion Of The People's Republic Of China In The Visa Waiver Program.
Title
Tourism Industry; Visa Waiver Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (S) Referred to TSM/TIA. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 371). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Adopted with Representative(s) Cullen, M. Lee, Yamane voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Thielen excused (1). | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from INT/TOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1523-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Tokioka, Awana, Choy, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ching. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on INT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Brower, Choy, Evans, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by INT/TOU on Monday, 03-19-12 9:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Referred to INT/TOU, referral sheet 47 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-13 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR97 (Same As) 2012-04-05 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.