HI HCR13 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR13
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Hawaiian Airlines To Cease Outsourcing Call Center Operations To The Philippines And To Return These Operations To Hawaii.
Title
Urging Hawaiian Airlines To Cease Outsourcing Call Center Operations To The Philippines And To Return These Operations To Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6). |
2019-03-25 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1719), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Eli, Ichiyama, Kitagawa, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Quinlan. |
2019-03-15 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:35AM in conference room 309. |
2019-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in conference room 309. |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2019-02-04 | House | Offered |
2019-02-01 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR13 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
HR11 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
HR11 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Cachola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, Creagan, Eli, Holt, Nakamura, Quinlan excused (6).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=13&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR13_.HTM |