HI HCR154 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Develop A State Action Plan To Combat Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease In The State.
Title
Chronic Obstructive Pulmonary Disease
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-23 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-23 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 785). | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2012-04-23 | (S) Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3543) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2012-04-19 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Chun Oakland, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, Wakai, Slom. | |
2012-04-18 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-12 1:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to HTH. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 596). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1749-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-11-12 11:15AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1375-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Hanohano, Jordan, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Pine. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-27-12 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR118 (Same As) 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.