HI HCR16 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR16
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Human Services & Homelessness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Department Of Human Services Provide An Estimate Of The Budget Appropriation And Legislative Action Necessary To Fund An Expansion Of Med-quest Coverage To All Post-partum Women For A Period Of Twelve Months Following Childbirth.
Title
Requesting That The Department Of Human Services Provide An Estimate Of The Budget Appropriation And Legislative Action Necessary To Fund An Expansion Of Med-quest Coverage To All Post-partum Women For A Period Of Twelve Months Following Childbirth.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-01-21 | House | Offered |
2020-01-17 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR14 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to HSH, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR16 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
HCR16 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=16&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR16_.HTM |