HI HCR162 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-29 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Provision Of Education To Incarcerated Parents To Ensure Child Support Issues Are Addressed Without Delay And Upon Release, To Prepare Them For Reintegration With Their Children And Families, Including Grandparents Who Have Raised Their Children.
Title
Incarcerated Parents; Additional Information and Training by DPS
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] |
Rep. Barbara Marumoto [R] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-29 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 662). | |
2010-04-29 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) One Day Notice 04-29-10. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Reported from PSM/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3239) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Green, Hemmings; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Gabbard, Galuteria, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Bunda, English, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-19 | (S) The committee(s) on PSM/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-22-10 9:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to PSM/HMS. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 498). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1304-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Reported from PBS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 941-10), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Aquino, Awana, Keith-Agaran, M. Lee, Nakashima, Rhoads, Saiki, Souki, Takumi, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-18-10 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-03-08 | (H) Referred to PBS, FIN, referral sheet 42 | |
2010-03-05 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-04 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR100 (Same As) 2010-04-09 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.