HI HCR165 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services To Allow State-owned Lands To Be Used By Community Groups For An Open Market In Wahiawa.
Title
Open markets; Agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 673). | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) One Day Notice 04-27-11. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Waived referral to AGL/WLH, WAM. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Referred to AGL/WLH, WAM. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 614). | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Chong, Herkes, Kawakami, McKelvey, Thielen, Tokioka excused. | |
2011-04-15 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1658), recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-13 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Chong, Har, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward. | |
2011-04-11 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-13-11 10:30AM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Carroll excused. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from AGR/WLO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1343), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) The committees on WLO recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Chang, Har, Cabanilla, Chong, Coffman, Herkes, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Choy, Evans, Nishimoto, Marumoto, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Tokioka. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/WLO on Friday, 04-01-11 10:15AM in conference room 325. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Referred to AGR/WLO, FIN, referral sheet 40 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-15 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR144 (Same As) 2011-04-15 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=165 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR165_.HTM |