HI HCR167 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Referred to HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-14 - Referred to HTH, WAM.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of The Auditor To Conduct A Mental Health Workforce Assessment Of Mental Health Professionals And Mental Health Facilities To Identify Shortages And Aid In Proposing Solutions To Address Those Shortages.
Title
Mental Health Workforce Assessment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 409). |
2015-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1409), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:15PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1291) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2015-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-20-15 8:45AM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |