HI HCR167 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Prepare And Submit A Proposal That Delineates How It Will Increase The Reimbursement Rate To Providers Of Service For Workers' Compensation Claimants.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Labor And Industrial Relations To Prepare And Submit A Proposal That Delineates How It Will Increase The Reimbursement Rate To Providers Of Service For Workers' Compensation Claimants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1472), recommending referral to CPC. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-21 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-23-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-23-17 at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:40AM in conference room 309. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to LAB, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR167 (Carry Over) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=167&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR167_.HTM |