HI HCR167 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Say excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Say excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing The Unique Language And Contributions To Hawaiian Culture Of The Niihau Community.
Title
Recognizing The Unique Language And Contributions To Hawaiian Culture Of The Niihau Community.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Say excused (3). |
2020-06-30 | House | Reported from WLH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-06-29 | House | The committees on WLH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Tarnas, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Lowen, Ward. |
2020-06-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Monday, 06-29-20 11:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Wednesday 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WLH on Wednesday, 03-18-20 10:00AM in conference room 325. |
2020-03-11 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 40 |
2020-03-06 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR146 (Same As) 2020-06-30 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Say excused (3).
HCR167 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 33
HCR167 (Carry Over) 2019-03-14 - Referred to EEP, JUD, referral sheet 33