HI HCR170 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Employees' Retirement System To Work In Conjunction With A Reputable Firm Of Investment Consultants To Submit A Report Assessing The Impact On The Employees' Retirement System's Portfolio Of Fossil Fuel Investments To The Legislature.
Title
ERS; Fossil Fuels; Sustainability; Renewable Energy; Investment
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Lopresti [D] | Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Scott Nishimoto [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1359-16) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har, Takumi, Tupola. |
2016-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-22-16 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR120 (Same As) 2016-03-29 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).