HI HCR183 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-16 - (S) Referred to CPN/WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Perform A Focused Financial And Performance Audit Of The Cable Television Division Of The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs.
Title
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs; Focused Financial and Performance Audit; Cable Television Division
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-16 | (S) Referred to CPN/WAM. | |
2012-04-16 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 604). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1774-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Tokioka, Manahan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Wednesday, 04-04-12 3:15PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on LMG with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Saiki, Ward, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1418-12), recommending referral to LMG. | |
2012-03-29 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Keith-Agaran, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Ching. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-29-12 2:35PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to CPC, LMG, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |