HI HCR183 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR183
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott, McKelvey excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott, McKelvey excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Approval From The Federal Highway Administration For A Proposed Low-income And Workforce Housing Project Located Within The Footprint Of A Federally-funded Interstate Highway.
Title
Requesting Approval From The Federal Highway Administration For A Proposed Low-income And Workforce Housing Project Located Within The Footprint Of A Federally-funded Interstate Highway.
Sponsors
Rep. Sam Kong [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott, McKelvey excused (3). |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported from HSG/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1393), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Quinlan, Brower, Hashem, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-21 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, Quinlan, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG/TRN on Tuesday, 03-21-17 10:45AM in conference room 423. |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to HSG/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2017-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR183 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott, McKelvey excused (3).
HR107 (Same As) 2017-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott, McKelvey excused (3).
HR107 (Same As) 2017-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott, McKelvey excused (3).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=183&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HCR183_.HTM |