HI HCR189 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Broadband Assistance Advisory Council To Create A Master Plan Of Providing Universal High Speed Broadband Access In Resort Areas And Other Areas Of Importance Throughout Hawaii, Including But Not Limited To Honolulu International Airport And Hawaii Public Schools.
Title
Broadband; Resort Areas; Universal Wireless Access; Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism Working Group
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Kawakami [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 650). |
2015-04-30 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2015-04-30 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Matsumoto, McDermott, Say, Thielen, Yamane excused (5). |
2015-04-30 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2015-04-24 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 669) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-24-15. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1666) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Slom, Baker, Chun Oakland, Espero, Harimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Referred to EDT. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 354). |
2015-04-08 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-08 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Ward excused (2). |
2015-04-08 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1394), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Woodson, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, Oshiro, San Buenaventura, Takayama, Fukumoto Chang; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 6 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Yamane, McDermott. |
2015-04-02 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Monday 04-06-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-06-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-30 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-01-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-30 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Lowen excused (2). |
2015-03-30 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1248) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2015-03-25 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Brower, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Ohno, Ward. |
2015-03-23 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-25-15 11:00AM in conference room 312. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-20-15 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |