HI HCR189 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR189
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kahaluu, North Kona, Island Of Hawaii.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kahaluu, North Kona, Island Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1586-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-23 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Kong, McKelvey, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee, Lowen. |
2018-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-23-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR189 (Carry Over) 2017-03-22 - Re-referred to EDN, referral sheet 34
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=189&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR189_.HTM |