HI HCR189 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State To Prohibit The Introduction Of Biocontrol Agents That Might Threaten Economically Important Forage Grass Species.
Title
Urging The State To Prohibit The Introduction Of Biocontrol Agents That Might Threaten Economically Important Forage Grass Species.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Rose Martinez [D] | Rep. Jenna Takenouchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-16 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-16-24. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3823) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-04-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Rhoads, Awa. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-10-24 1:15PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to AEN. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 463). |
2024-03-25 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-25 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Poepoe voting no (2) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Kapela, Woodson excused (3). |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1382-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, Kahaloa, Cochran, Lowen, Perruso, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:15AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to AGR, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR169 (Same As) 2024-03-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.