HI HCR19 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR19
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN/TIA, JUD, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN/TIA, JUD, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Federal Aviation Administration To Take Action Regarding Commercial Helicopter Tour Operations In Hawaii.
Title
Urging The Federal Aviation Administration To Take Action Regarding Commercial Helicopter Tour Operations In Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to TRN/TIA, JUD, referral sheet 39 |
2020-01-23 | House | Offered |
2020-01-21 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR19 (Carry Over) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR12 (Same As) 2020-05-19 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
SCR12 (Same As) 2020-05-19 - Report adopted, referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=19&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR19_.HTM |