HI HCR193 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Referred to EET/WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-11 - Referred to EET/WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Governor And State Departments To Investigate Opportunities Provided By The Direct Pay Provision In The Inflation Reduction Act That Allows For Direct Payment Of Clean Energy Incentives To State Government Entities For The Cost Of Installing Solar Energy Systems In State Facilities.
Title
Urging The Governor And State Departments To Investigate Opportunities Provided By The Direct Pay Provision In The Inflation Reduction Act That Allows For Direct Payment Of Clean Energy Incentives To State Government Entities For The Cost Of Installing Solar Energy Systems In State Facilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to EET/WAM. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 662). |
2023-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-05 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2). |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2036), recommending adoption. |
2023-04-03 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Garcia voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2023-03-29 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1682), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-03-23 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Perruso, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-23-23 9:30AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR198 (Same As) 2023-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=193&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HCR193_.HTM |