HI HCR195 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Financial Audit Of Each County To Examine The Use Of And Needs For State Funds.
Title
Financial Audit; State Funds; Counties
Sponsors
Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1644), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-15 1:15PM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 420). |
2015-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1428), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2015-04-02 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR130 (Same As) 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=195&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR195_.HTM |