HI HCR201 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing Within The Department Of Accounting And General Services A Task Force To Plan And Coordinate The Celebration Of The Fiftieth Anniversary Of The Hawaii State Capitol.
Title
Hawaii State Capitol Fiftieth Anniversary; Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2). |
2015-03-31 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1322) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2015-03-24 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Choy, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Woodson. |
2015-03-23 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 03-24-15 9:15AM in conference room 312. |
2015-03-23 | House | The committee(s) on VMI recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-24-15 at 9:15 AM. |
2015-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 03-23-15 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR137 (Same As) 2015-03-31 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Oshiro, Tokioka excused (2).