HI HCR217 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting the Auditor to conduct an audit of policies and procedures of the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands with regard to the revocable permit program, in particular, the issuance of contracts and commercial leases.
Title
Requesting the Auditor to conduct an audit of policies and procedures of the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands with regard to the revocable permit program, in particular, the issuance of contracts and commercial leases.
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-19 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by OMH on Wednesday, 03-19-14 9:45AM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-12 | House | Referred to OMH, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2014-03-07 | House | Offered |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=217&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR217_.HTM |