HI HCR222 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Education To Hasten Its Efforts To Adopt Administrative Rules To Enable The Implementation Of The Law Governing Charter Schools.
Title
Charter Schools
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-17-10 2:05PM in conference room 309. | |
2010-03-11 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 47 | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Offered | |
2010-03-09 | (H) To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=222&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HCR222_.HTM |