HI HCR222 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Require Counseling For Anyone Involved With Bullying In School And Possible Expulsion For Failure To Comply Therewith.
Title
Bullying in School; Counseling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Wednesday, 03-30-11 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR193 (Same As) 2011-03-30 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=222 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HCR222_.HTM |