HI HCR222 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-27 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Task Force To Investigate The Feral Cat Infestation At The University Of Hawaii At Manoa.
Title
University of Hawaii at Manoa; Feral Cat Infestation
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-19 | House | Referred to HLT, HED, referral sheet 40 |
2013-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR176 (Same As) 2013-03-27 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=222&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR222_.HTM |