HI HCR235 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-23 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Phase Out Of Production And Importation Of Decabromodiphenyl Ether In The United States.
Title
Decabromodiphenyl ether; Environmental Protection Agency
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-23 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 640). | |
2010-04-23 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) One Day Notice 04-23-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3221) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2010-04-20 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Hooser; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kokubun, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-16 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-10 10:35AM in conference room 225. | |
2010-04-13 | (S) Referred to ENE. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 517). | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1277-10) as amended in HD 2, recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Takai, Wakai, Ward. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 04-08-10 9:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on EBM as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 974-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to EBM. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro, Finnegan. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-18-10 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2010-03-12 | (H) Referred to HLT, EBM, referral sheet 48 | |
2010-03-10 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR165 (Same As) 2010-04-09 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR209 (Same As) 2010-04-08 - (H) Referred to HLT, EBM, referral sheet 62
SR107 (Same As) 2010-04-06 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
SCR209 (Same As) 2010-04-08 - (H) Referred to HLT, EBM, referral sheet 62
SR107 (Same As) 2010-04-06 - (S) Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).