HI HCR31 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - The committee on HMS deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Conduct A Study Of The Best Management Practices In Adult Care Homes.
Title
Adult Care Homes; Best Management Practices
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | Senate | The committee on HMS deferred the measure. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | The committee on HTH deferred the measure. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-15-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Referred to HMS/HTH. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 437). |
2014-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Oshiro, Say excused (4). |
2014-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1470-14), recommending adoption. |
2014-04-02 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, Woodson. |
2014-04-01 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-31 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-02-14 3:35PM in conference room 308. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1317-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-20 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Kobayashi, Belatti, Hashem, Jordan, Morikawa, Oshiro, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan. |
2014-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 03-20-14 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2014-02-04 | House | Offered |
2014-02-03 | House | To be offered. |