HI HCR4 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR4
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Counties Prepare A Report To The Legislature On Proposed Applications Of Congestion Pricing Strategies.
Title
Requesting That The Counties Prepare A Report To The Legislature On Proposed Applications Of Congestion Pricing Strategies.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-01-16 | House | Offered |
2020-01-15 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR4 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
SCR1 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - Referred to PSM/TRS.
SCR1 (Same As) 2020-01-28 - Referred to PSM/TRS.
Subjects
Congestion Pricing
Counties
Hawaii Council of Mayors Package
Report to Legislature
Traffic
Transportation
Counties
Hawaii Council of Mayors Package
Report to Legislature
Traffic
Transportation
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=4&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR4_.HTM |