HI HCR4 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR4
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau, In Consultation With The John A. Burns School Of Medicine At The University Of Hawaii At Manoa And Department Of Health, To Conduct A Study On The Cumulative Health Effects Of Persistent Urban Noise In Honolulu.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau, In Consultation With The John A. Burns School Of Medicine At The University Of Hawaii At Manoa And Department Of Health, To Conduct A Study On The Cumulative Health Effects Of Persistent Urban Noise In Honolulu.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-24 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1264) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to CPC. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-18 | House | Referred to HHH, CPC, referral sheet 15 |
2021-01-25 | House | Offered |
2021-01-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR4 (Carry Over) 2021-03-24 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on CPC as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
HR6 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR6 (Same As) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.