HI HCR4 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 15
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-16 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 15
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The County Governments To Review Their Respective Government Structures To Identify Organizational Risks Of Corruption And Ethical Violations And To Develop Systematic Improvements To Minimize Those Risks.
Title
Urging The County Governments To Review Their Respective Government Structures To Identify Organizational Risks Of Corruption And Ethical Violations And To Develop Systematic Improvements To Minimize Those Risks.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 15 |
2023-01-19 | House | Offered |
2023-01-18 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR2 (Same As) 2023-01-30 - Referred to PSM/JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=4&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HCR4_.HTM |