HI HCR41 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 898).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-04 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 898).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Public Utilities Commission To Open A New Proceeding Relating To The Removal Of Abandoned Or Double Utility Poles, Lines, And Equipment.
Title
Urging The Public Utilities Commission To Open A New Proceeding Relating To The Removal Of Abandoned Or Double Utility Poles, Lines, And Equipment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 898). |
2023-05-02 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-05-02 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). |
2023-05-02 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2023-04-28 | House | Deferred one day 05-02-23. |
2023-04-27 | House | One (1) day notice, Friday, 04-28-23. |
2023-04-24 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 952) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-24-23. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1955) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Fukunaga, McKelvey, Richards, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-23 2:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 577). |
2023-04-03 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2023-04-03 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aiu, Cochran, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1910), recommending adoption. |
2023-03-29 | House | The committee on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Sayama, Amato, Belatti, Hashem, Hussey-Burdick, Gates, Onishi, Tam, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2023-03-24 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-29-23 2:10PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-10 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 18 |
2023-03-09 | House | Offered |
2023-03-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR45 (Same As) 2023-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.