HI HCR45 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-22 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Department Of Defense To Establish And Fund A Veteran Women Services Coordinator Position Within The Office Of Veterans' Services.
Title
Office of Veterans' Services; Veteran Women Services Coordinator
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1646), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Keith-Agaran. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-20-15 1:15PM in conference room 312. |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 377). |
2015-04-09 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-09 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka excused (1). |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1403), recommending adoption. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Kawakami, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, C. Lee. |
2015-04-02 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-30 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and DeCoite, Lowen excused (2). |
2015-03-30 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1242), recommending referral to JUD. |
2015-03-23 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Brower, Cachola, DeCoite, Kawakami, Kong, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Ward. |
2015-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Monday, 03-23-15 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2015-02-20 | House | Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 22 |
2015-02-20 | House | Offered |
2015-02-19 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR19 (Same As) 2015-04-09 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SR7 (Same As) 2015-02-25 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
SCR26 (Same As) 2015-02-25 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
SR7 (Same As) 2015-02-25 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
SCR26 (Same As) 2015-02-25 - Referred to PSM, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=45&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/HCR45_.HTM |