HI HCR46 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (S) The committee(s) on TSM/TIA deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-16-12 10:03AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-13 - (S) The committee(s) on TSM/TIA deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-16-12 10:03AM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Visa Improvements To Stimulate International Tourism To The United States Of America Act.
Title
Visa Improvements to Stimulate International Tourism to the United States Act
Sponsors
Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM/TIA deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-16-12 10:03AM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-10 | (S) The committee(s) on TSM/TIA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-16-12 10:03AM in conference room 224. | |
2012-04-02 | (S) Referred to TSM/TIA. | |
2012-03-30 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 333). | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Manahan excused (2). | |
2012-03-28 | (H) Reported from TOU/INT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1352-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on INT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Awana, Hashem, Brower, Choy, Evans, Nishimoto, Tokioka, Tsuji, Marumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on TOU recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Tokioka, Awana, Choy, Evans, Hashem, Nishimoto, Tsuji, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) McKelvey, Ching. | |
2012-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TOU/INT on Monday, 03-19-12 9:30AM in conference room 312. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Referred to TOU/INT, referral sheet 24 | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Offered | |
2012-02-08 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR25 (Same As) 2012-03-28 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.