HI HCR46 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR46
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Re-referred to PVM, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Re-referred to PVM, referral sheet 45
Pending: House Public Safety, Veterans, & Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau, In Consultation With The Department Of The Attorney General, To Conduct A Study Relating To The Reporting Requirements Of Section 353c-8.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Requesting The Legislative Reference Bureau, In Consultation With The Department Of The Attorney General, To Conduct A Study Relating To The Reporting Requirements Of Section 353c-8.5, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | Re-referred to PVM, referral sheet 45 |
2020-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-03-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PVM on Friday, 03-13-20 10:00AM in conference room 430. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to PVM, LMG, referral sheet 39 |
2020-02-19 | House | Offered |
2020-02-18 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR31 (Same As) 2020-03-13 - The committee(s) on PVM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR46 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR46 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=46&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR46_.HTM |