HI HCR48 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-03 - (S) Referred to AGL.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-03 - (S) Referred to AGL.
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Declaring Saturdays and Sundays to be "Eat Local, Buy Local" Day in Hawaii and Encouraging Families, Restaurants, and Grocers to Buy Hawaii-Grown Foods, Flowers, and Produce.
Title
"Declaring Saturdays and Sundays to be "Eat Local, Buy Local" Day in Hawaii and Encouraging Families, Restaurants, and Grocers to Buy Hawaii-Grown Foods, Flowers, and Produce.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-03 | (S) Referred to AGL. | |
2012-04-02 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 341). | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Reported from AGR/ERB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1401-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) The committees on ERB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Awana, Brower, Evans, Hashem, Tsuji, Marumoto, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Tokioka. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Hashem, Awana, Brower, Choy, Evans, McKelvey, Marumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Tokioka, Riviere. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/ERB on Friday, 03-23-12 10:00AM in House conference room 312. | |
2012-02-15 | (H) Referred to AGR/ERB, referral sheet 28 | |
2012-02-14 | (H) Offered | |
2012-02-13 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR27 (Same As) 2012-03-30 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.