HI HCR48 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Establishment Of A Task Force To Examine The Feasibility Of Forming A University Of Hawaii At Hilo Men's Volleyball Team.
Title
University of Hawaii at Hilo Men's Volleyball Team Task Force
Sponsors
Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Richard Onishi [D] |
Rep. Isaac Choy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 738). |
2013-04-24 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-24 | House | Adopted as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Brower, Har, Oshiro excused (3). |
2013-04-24 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2013-04-22 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 722) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported from HRE/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1603) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Dela Cruz, Espero, Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, English, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Ige, Kidani, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-19-13 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Referred to HRE/WAM. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 659). |
2013-04-12 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1642), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2013-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1254), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-14 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Aquino, Hanohano, Nakashima, Ohno, Takai, Takumi, Cheape, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 03-14-13 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-20 | House | Offered |
2013-02-19 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR30 (Same As) 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.