HI HCR54 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - (S) Referred to TIA.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-10 - (S) Referred to TIA.
Pending: Senate Transportation and International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The United States Bureau Of The Census And Urging All Hawaii Residents To Participate In 2010.
Title
U.S. Census Participation
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Pono Chong [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to TIA. | |
2010-03-04 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 253). | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, Marumoto, Nakashima, M. Oshiro, Thielen, Tokioka, Ward excused. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Reported from EBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-02-18 | (H) The committees on EBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Choy, Evans, Tokioka, Tsuji, Wooley, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Berg, Manahan, Takai, Wakai. | |
2010-02-12 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by EBM on Thursday, 02-18-10 9:00AM in conference room 312. | |
2010-02-04 | (H) Referred to EBM, referral sheet 17 | |
2010-02-02 | (H) Offered | |
2010-02-01 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR16 (Same As) 2010-03-03 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.