HI HCR62 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR62
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Notify Beneficiaries Through Beneficiary Consultation Prior To Disposing Of Hawaiian Home Lands And To Exercise Other Protections Of Beneficiary Interests.
Title
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Notify Beneficiaries Through Beneficiary Consultation Prior To Disposing Of Hawaiian Home Lands And To Exercise Other Protections Of Beneficiary Interests.
Sponsors
Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
2022-03-10 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR56 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 27
HCR62 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - Referred to WAL/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 19
SCR188 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to HWN.
HCR62 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - Referred to WAL/CMV, FIN, referral sheet 19
SCR188 (Same As) 2022-03-16 - Referred to HWN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=62&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR62_.HTM |