HI HCR67 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR67
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to IAC/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - Referred to IAC/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Oppose The Federal Communications Commission's Recent Decision To Overturn The 2015 Net Neutrality Rules And To Pass Legislation That Would Retain Net Neutrality Nationwide.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Oppose The Federal Communications Commission's Recent Decision To Overturn The 2015 Net Neutrality Rules And To Pass Legislation That Would Retain Net Neutrality Nationwide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to IAC/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR53 (Same As) 2018-03-13 - Referred to IAC/CPC, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR67 (Carry Over) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR67 (Carry Over) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=67&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HCR67_.HTM |