HI HCR67 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR67
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The State Include A Four Hundred Fifty-bed, Minimum-security Housing Facility In Its Design And Plans For The Proposed Oahu Community Correctional Center.
Title
Requesting That The State Include A Four Hundred Fifty-bed, Minimum-security Housing Facility In Its Design And Plans For The Proposed Oahu Community Correctional Center.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from PVM/JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1835), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Lowen, McKelvey, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Morikawa; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Creagan, Say, Yamane. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on PVM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Kong; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Ohno, McDermott. |
2019-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PVM/JUD on Friday, 03-22-19 2:05PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to PVM/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
2019-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR67 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR67 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR67 (Same As) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Perruso voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=67&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HCR67_.HTM |