HI HCR68 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR68
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Education To Include The Teaching Of Financial Literacy In The Existing Personal Transition Plan Course Requirement For Each Student.
Title
Urging The Department Of Education To Include The Teaching Of Financial Literacy In The Existing Personal Transition Plan Course Requirement For Each Student.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
2022-03-10 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR61 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to EDN, CPC, referral sheet 27
HCR68 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR11 (Same As) 2022-03-21 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
HCR68 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR11 (Same As) 2022-03-21 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=68&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HCR68_.HTM |