HI HCR71 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HCR71
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to IAA/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate International Affairs and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to IAA/GVO, WAM.
Pending: Senate International Affairs and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services And The County Of Hawaii To Determine The Rightful Owner Of The King Kamehameha The Great Statue In North Kohala.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Accounting And General Services And The County Of Hawaii To Determine The Rightful Owner Of The King Kamehameha The Great Statue In North Kohala.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | Senate | Referred to IAA/GVO, WAM. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 412). |
2017-04-05 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1632), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:35AM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1528) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-16 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ito, Tokioka, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Onishi. |
2017-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 03-16-17 9:30AM in conference room 429. |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-03 | House | Offered |
2017-03-02 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR71 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to IAA/GVO, WAM.
HR37 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR37 (Same As) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
County of Hawaii
Department of Accounting and General Services
King Kamehameha the Great Statue
North Kohala
Ownership
Department of Accounting and General Services
King Kamehameha the Great Statue
North Kohala
Ownership