HI HCR73 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - The committee(s) on HUS/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-21 - The committee(s) on HUS/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting Nonprofit Organizations That Provide Outreach Services To Homeless Individuals To Evaluate Officer And Employee Compensation.
Title
Nonprofit; Homeless Outreach; Housing; Employee; Officer; Salary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on HUS/HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2013-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS/HLT on Thursday, 03-21-13 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to HUS/HLT, FIN, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-08 | House | Offered |
2013-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=73&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HCR73_.HTM |