HI HCR73 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 5 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-17 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing Captain Ira Barnes Dutton And Urging The National Park Service To Work Toward Relocating His Statue From Its Current Location At Saint Joseph Church In Kamalo To The Kalaupapa Peninsula.
Title
Relocation of the Ira Barnes Dutton Statue
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2014-03-06 | House | Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR50 (Same As) 2014-03-17 - Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 36
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=73&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HCR73_.HTM |