HI HCR73 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HCR73
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-2)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Report To The Legislature Current And Proposed Fee Structures For Access To State Parks, Beaches, Trails, And Other State Facilities Under The Department's Jurisdiction.
Title
Urging The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Report To The Legislature Current And Proposed Fee Structures For Access To State Parks, Beaches, Trails, And Other State Facilities Under The Department's Jurisdiction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-02 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR56 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH/TIA, FIN, referral sheet 39
HCR73 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
HCR73 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=73&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HCR73_.HTM |