HI HCR79 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 7 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Referred to JDL.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating April 28, 2016, As "workers' Memorial Day" In Hawaii In Memory Of Workers Killed, Injured, Or Disabled In The Workplace.
Title
Workers' Memorial Day; Workplace Injuries and Fatalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 432). |
2016-04-07 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1525-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Jordan. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1365-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har, Takumi, Tupola. |
2016-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-22-16 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2016-03-11 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2016-03-10 | House | Offered |
2016-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR41 (Same As) 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HCR&billnumber=79&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HCR79_.HTM |